U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00216-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GREEN, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Terminating Counsel ]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Rule 44(c) Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 23, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 21, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 18, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response to Court Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.