U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00036
  • Case Name: Hancock Whitney Bank v. JM Construction Company, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing Proposed Order]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 20, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • March 13, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Application to Clerk for Entry of Default]
  • March 13, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.