U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00028-10
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motions Referred]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue-Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • April 23, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • April 16, 2025: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • April 11, 2025: [Certification Regarding Preliminary Guideline Calculations of P.O.]
  • April 11, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detain]
  • April 09, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Detention Hearing ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 01, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Filing Proposed Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Arraignment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.