U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00205-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tymes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.