U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00201-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Expedite Sentencing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order to Produce Prisoner for Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 13, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.