U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00018-4
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Interpreter Needed]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Response]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.