U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00391
  • Case Name: Beemac, Inc. v. Glass America of Illinois, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply Brief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 14, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 13, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply Brief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.