U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00202
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Retirement System of Alabama et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 10, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 14, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 14, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 14, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.