U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00048
  • Case Name: Cooper et al v. Barnett et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 22, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.