U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00420
  • Case Name: Local Union 903 I.B.E.W. Health & Welfare Fund, et al v. MSH Properties, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 15, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 01, 2025: [Document Referred]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Application to Clerk for Entry of Default]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer due deadline]
  • March 14, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.