U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Miller v. Trans Union LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • May 01, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Filing Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.