U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00060
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Elmore Sand & Gravel, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 14, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.