U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00199-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARRENO-CRUZ (INTERPRETER)
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Variance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 14, 2025: [Variance]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detainer Lodged]
  • March 14, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 14, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 14, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.