U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00228
  • Case Name: Markel Insurance Company v. ATOZ Tech, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Summary Judgment - Response Time]
  • April 04, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • April 04, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Entry of Default]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.