U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00055
  • Case Name: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company v. Nassar et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 17, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 16, 2025: [Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 08, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Counterclaim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.