U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00414
  • Case Name: Utesch v. Austal USA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response to District Judge Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response to District Judge Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.