U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00171
  • Case Name: Waldrep v. State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 27, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 18, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 17, 2025: [Complaint, Amended]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.