U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WINDHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 17, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 17, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.