U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Flores-Quiahua
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion to Advance Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Advance Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Position re: Sentencing Factors]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Guilty Plea & Minute Entry (Text Only)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.