U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Ackers v. Reliable Express, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Remand]
  • April 22, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Removal, Amended]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Disclosures]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 18, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Removal, Amended]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.