U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00217
  • Case Name: Nix v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 28, 2025: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Alter Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • March 20, 2025: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
  • March 20, 2025: [Inmate 1983 Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.