U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00093-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliver
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 04, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sealed Document Without Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.