U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00080
  • Case Name: Amerco Real Estate Company v. City of Daphne et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order]
  • May 02, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • April 22, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 21, 2025: [Reply Brief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 24, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 21, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.