U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00470
  • Case Name: Linton v. ATS Operating, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Preliminary Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.