U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00218
  • Case Name: UMB Bank, N.A. v. Jackson Hospital & Clinic, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
  • April 21, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Bankruptcy Designation of Record]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.