U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00115
  • Case Name: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC v. Rice
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 22, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 04, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.