U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00103-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Snowden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • April 15, 2025: [Seal]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Terminating Counsel ]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Release from Custody]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 27, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.