U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00116
  • Case Name: Sweet Mama's, LLC d/b/a Naman's Catering v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Answer due deadline]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 26, 2025: [Service Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
  • March 25, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.