U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00208-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lowery
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.