U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Escobar-Quiroz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference re: Guidelines]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Federal Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Interpreter Needed]
  • April 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.