U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Molette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Detain]
  • April 16, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment ]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 28, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order and Writ on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detain]
  • March 27, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.