U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00239
  • Case Name: Melvin v. Grease Monkey International, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 23, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 28, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 27, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • March 27, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.