U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00222-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera-Solano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 16, 2025: [Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Expedite Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 10, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 10, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.