U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00221-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lugardo-Rojo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 10, 2025: [Downward Departure - 5K2 or 5K3.1]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Accepting Guilty Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Consent Plea Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of No Objection to Magistrate Judge Recommendation (Guilty Plea)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Report and Recommendations Concerning Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 08, 2025: [Consent to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 08, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Expedite Sentencing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • March 31, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.