U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HICKS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 31, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 30, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • March 30, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 30, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • March 30, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 30, 2025: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.