U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 01, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.