U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00128
  • Case Name: American Remediation & Environmental, Inc. v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order - Document NOTED]
  • April 03, 2025: [Service Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 01, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Proposed Summons]
  • April 01, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.