U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00248
  • Case Name: The Range 231 v. Calhoun et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 25, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 22, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.