U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00197-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PETTUS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 09, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Terminating Counsel ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 02, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.