U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00622
  • Case Name: Daniels v. Coca-Cola Bottling Company UNITED, Inc. (MAG+)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response to Order]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Clarify]
  • April 21, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.