U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradley, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 24, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 18, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Deadline/Hearing]
  • April 13, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 04, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 04, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 03, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 03, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 03, 2025: [Protective Order ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.