U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00250
  • Case Name: Smith v. Subway #27739-0 et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.