U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00260
  • Case Name: Gugliatto v. Toomey et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 29, 2025: [AO FORM 85]
  • April 29, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 21, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • April 18, 2025: [Return Receipt Card]
  • April 14, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order to Answer Habeas]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Proposed Summons]
  • April 07, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice to Counsel]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 04, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 04, 2025: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.