U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WASHINGTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • April 08, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 07, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.