U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Maceo Levar Edwards, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 08, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
  • April 07, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.