U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00455
  • Case Name: Hamilton v. The Alabama Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 17, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Mail Returned]
  • April 10, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 09, 2025: [Complaint, Amended]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.