U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00147
  • Case Name: Acuity v. Durham et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Motions Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Document Referred]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits]
  • April 10, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.