U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cash-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sealed Response to Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.