U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCGILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue Trial - Ends of Justice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue Trial]
  • April 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Oral Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel - Oral Motion]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.