U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00291
  • Case Name: Lee v. Butler et al (INMATE 2)
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Inmate 1983 Complaint, Amended]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 18, 2025: [AO FORM 85]
  • April 18, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 18, 2025: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit]
  • April 16, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 16, 2025: [Inmate 1983 Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.